NY A10532 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.398
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to derivative transactions and over the counter derivative instruments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to derivative transactions and over the counter derivative instruments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.398
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.998
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7306B
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.333
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.333
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 10532a
2012-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-04Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S07306 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10532A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback