NY A10529 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the imposition of an occupancy tax in the city of Yonkers to September 1, 2021.
Title
Extends the imposition of an occupancy tax in the city of Yonkers to September 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7419 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1055 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07419 (Same As) 2018-07-09 - SIGNED CHAP.112