NY A10528 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-1)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - substituted by s8427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2020.

Sponsors

Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]
Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]
Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]

Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28Assemblysubstituted by s8427
2020-05-28Assemblyrules report cal.59
2020-05-28Assemblyreported
2020-05-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08427 (Same As) 2020-05-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback