NY A10528 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2020.
Title
Establishes a coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) public employee death benefit for individuals who reported to their usual place of employment or an alternate worksite at the direction of their employer on or after March 1, 2020 and such individual contracted COVID-19 within 45 days of reporting to such workplace as confirmed by a laboratory test or by a licensed physician and such individual died on or before December 31, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.89 |
2020-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Senate | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2020-05-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.59 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | substituted for a10528 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.672 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8427 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.59 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08427 (Same As) 2020-05-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89