NY A10521 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8113a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to issuing a moratorium on utility termination of services during periods of pandemics and/or state of emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to issuing a moratorium on utility termination of services during periods of pandemics and/or state of emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted by s8113a
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.54
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-27Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-05-24Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08113 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.108

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback