NY A10519 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that unredeemed container deposits shall be credited to the environmental protection fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that unredeemed container deposits shall be credited to the environmental protection fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatetabled
2012-12-17Senatevetoed memo.176
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1516
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7525
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.463
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.463
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-01Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07525 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10519

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback