NY A10517 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to conduct a study on the health impacts of COVID-19 on minorities in New York state.
Title
Requires the department of health to conduct a study on the health impacts of COVID-19 on minorities in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.99 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | substituted for a10517 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.652 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8245A |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-04-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8245a |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | motion to amend lost |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.50 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08245 (Same As) 2020-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.99