NY A10510 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4237a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4237a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to vendor fees at certain vendor tracks.
Title
Relates to vendor fees at certain vendor tracks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s4237a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.462 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04237 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.302