NY A10508 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing tax abatements for certain properties containing dwelling units; provides that in a city having a population of one million or more, a local law, ordinance, or resolution that may provide that the effective date of a rent increase exemption order and tax abatement certificate shall be May thirty-first, two thousand twenty-two for certain applicants.
Title
Relates to authorizing tax abatements for certain properties containing dwelling units; provides that in a city having a population of one million or more, a local law, ordinance, or resolution that may provide that the effective date of a rent increase exemption order and tax abatement certificate shall be May thirty-first, two thousand twenty-two for certain applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9471 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.672 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.672 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09471 (Same As) 2022-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.687