NY A10507 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends provisions for two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.94 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.985 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7747A |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.897 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07747 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10507