NY A10506 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taking of menhaden; provides that menhaden (Brevoortia tyrannus) from which oil or meal is made may not be taken from the waters of the marine district with a purse seine; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions.
Title
Relates to the taking of menhaden; provides that menhaden (Brevoortia tyrannus) from which oil or meal is made may not be taken from the waters of the marine district with a purse seine; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2123 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8570 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.940 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | print number 10506a |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08570 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10506A