NY A10505 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the number of judges in certain judicial districts and the family courts of New York city and Nassau and Saratoga counties.
Title
Expands the number of judges in certain judicial districts and the family courts of New York city and Nassau and Saratoga counties.
Sponsors
Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9466 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.670 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.670 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09466 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.365