NY A10498 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s9460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s9460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes modifications to the contract for excellence in a city school district in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Makes modifications to the contract for excellence in a city school district in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s9460 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.673 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09460 (Same As) 2022-09-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.16