NY A10486 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9464a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9464a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an increase in the federal poverty level for purposes of the child care program.
Title
Relates to an increase in the federal poverty level for purposes of the child care program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9464a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.657 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.657 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | print number 10486a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09464 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.360