NY A10474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to rate schedules for net energy metering and to directing the Long Island power authority to adopt a methodology for the establishment of a value of distributed energy resources crediting mechanism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to rate schedules for net energy metering and to directing the Long Island power authority to adopt a methodology for the establishment of a value of distributed energy resources crediting mechanism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.188
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.188
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-26Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S08273 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10474
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10474&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback