NY A10473 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - print number 10473a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - print number 10473a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the registration and regulation of interactive fantasy sports contests; requires all operators to register in New York state.
Title
Relates to the registration and regulation of interactive fantasy sports contests; requires all operators to register in New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10473a |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08128 (Same As) 2016-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES