NY A10469 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons who adjust claims on behalf of municipal cooperative health benefit plans shall be considered adjusters.
Title
Provides that certain persons who adjust claims on behalf of municipal cooperative health benefit plans shall be considered adjusters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7651 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.421 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07651 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.292