NY A10468 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the construction of pipe lines.
Title
Relates to the construction of pipe lines.
Sponsors
Asm. Frank Skartados [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Peter Lopez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.109 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.109 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07979 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS