NY A10448 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9369a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9369a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Community Outreach Center to file with the town of Ramapo assessor an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Title
Authorizes the Community Outreach Center to file with the town of Ramapo assessor an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9369a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.758 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10448a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09369 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.476