NY A10447 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9807
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9807
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to exchange parcels of land located in the city of Yonkers, county of Westchester, with 140 Warburton LLC for land of equal or greater value.
Title
Authorizes the state to exchange parcels of land located in the city of Yonkers, county of Westchester, with 140 Warburton LLC for land of equal or greater value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9807 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.657 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | print number 10447a |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09807 (Same As) 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR