NY A10443 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8252a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8252a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Katonah lake, Kitchawan lake, Oscaleta lake, Rippowam lake, Truesdale lake and Waccabuc lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Katonah lake, Kitchawan lake, Oscaleta lake, Rippowam lake, Truesdale lake and Waccabuc lake as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8252a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.355 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | print number 10443a |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08252 (Same As) 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.268