NY A10442 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the head of the office for people with developmental disabilities from changing the auspice of any individualized residential alternative that is operated by the state.
Title
Prohibits the head of the office for people with developmental disabilities from changing the auspice of any individualized residential alternative that is operated by the state.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Erik Bohen [R] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8200 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.487 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S08200 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.323