NY A10440 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to study and issue a report on online small business lending products and platforms that originate from lenders licensed by New York state or advertised to small businesses within the state.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to study and issue a report on online small business lending products and platforms that originate from lenders licensed by New York state or advertised to small businesses within the state.
Sponsors
Asm. Alice Cancel [D] | Asm. Erik Dilan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.218 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to banks |