NY A10438 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the determination of points for service award programs for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers during a state disaster emergency.
Title
Relates to the determination of points for service award programs for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers during a state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.113 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.40 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10438a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.653 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8251B |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8251A |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-04-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8251b |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.40 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10438a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08251 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.113