NY A10431 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the dissolution of union free school district number eight of the town of Canaan in the county of Columbia; makes technical corrections relating thereto; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations and the handling of records of such union free school district.
Title
Provides for the dissolution of union free school district number eight of the town of Canaan in the county of Columbia; makes technical corrections relating thereto; provides for the payment of the debts and obligations and the handling of records of such union free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | print number 10431a |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07338 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - referred to higher education