NY A10429 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7918a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7918a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to membership of the board of directors of the New York racing association.
Title
Relates to membership of the board of directors of the New York racing association.
Sponsors
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] |
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7918a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.322 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.322 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07918 (Same As) 2016-12-22 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR