NY A10424 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-11)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places requirements on honoring warranties of fire vehicles and ambulances; establishes the new emergency vehicle lemon law bill of rights; regulates arbitration proceedings.
Title
Places requirements on honoring warranties of fire vehicles and ambulances; establishes the new emergency vehicle lemon law bill of rights; regulates arbitration proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8251 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.456 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08251 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.387