NY A10417 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to convey to the Hampton Bays Water District, an easement in Meschutt Beach County Park for installation of a subaqueous water pipe crossing, provided that the county of Suffolk dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of the easement interest being alienated pursuant to section one of this act to the acquisition of new parklands and/or capital improvements to existing park and recreational facilities.
Title
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to convey to the Hampton Bays Water District, an easement in Meschutt Beach County Park for installation of a subaqueous water pipe crossing, provided that the county of Suffolk dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of the easement interest being alienated pursuant to section one of this act to the acquisition of new parklands and/or capital improvements to existing park and recreational facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.705 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1822 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9317 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.509 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09317 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10417