NY A10416 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s9294a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s9294a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for filing disability claims for a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Title
Extends the deadline for filing disability claims for a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s9294a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.434 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09294 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.561