NY A10399 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8951
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8951
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Donald Quehl, who has been continuously employed by the village of Pulaski as a part-time police officer, to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible list for appointment as a full-time police officer for such village in the county of Oswego.
Title
Authorizes Donald Quehl, who has been continuously employed by the village of Pulaski as a part-time police officer, to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible list for appointment as a full-time police officer for such village in the county of Oswego.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8951 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.752 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08951 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.540