NY A10394 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8289b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring residential health care facilities to submit an annual pandemic emergency plan to the commissioner of health; requires such plan to include a communication plan with families, plans to protect staff, residents and families against infection, and plans to preserve a resident's place at the facility if he or she is hospitalized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring residential health care facilities to submit an annual pandemic emergency plan to the commissioner of health; requires such plan to include a communication plan with families, plans to protect staff, residents and families against infection, and plans to preserve a resident's place at the facility if he or she is hospitalized.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted by s8289b
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.37
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-05-24Assemblyprint number 10394a
2020-05-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2020-05-04Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08289 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.114

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10394
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10394A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10394&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback