NY A10392 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the dispensing of partially filled prescriptions.
Title
Relates to the dispensing of partially filled prescriptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1045 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | print number 10392a |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08342 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - REFERRED TO HEALTH