NY A10383 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9325
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9325
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Discontinues the use of a parcel of land within the town of Greenburgh; alienates the parcel for the purpose of providing an easement for access to a public housing apartment complex known as Greenburgh Heights.
Title
Discontinues the use of a parcel of land within the town of Greenburgh; alienates the parcel for the purpose of providing an easement for access to a public housing apartment complex known as Greenburgh Heights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s9325 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.508 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 10383a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09325 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.549