NY A10372 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reimbursement for aerial spraying for mosquitoes on state land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reimbursement for aerial spraying for mosquitoes on state land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.469
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1369
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7340
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.259
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.259
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-24Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07340 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10372

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback