NY A10371 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic registration process integrated within designated agency applications; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic registration process integrated within designated agency applications; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.212
2016-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.212
2016-06-08Assemblyreported
2016-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2016-06-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2016-05-24Assemblyreferred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback