NY A10353 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to notify employees if they come into contact with other employees who have been diagnosed in relation to a disease outbreak causing a public health emergency; prohibits employers from disclosing the name of the diagnosed employee.
Title
Requires employers to notify employees if they come into contact with other employees who have been diagnosed in relation to a disease outbreak causing a public health emergency; prohibits employers from disclosing the name of the diagnosed employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.205 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 10353a |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08239 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 8239A