NY A10349 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that determinations by the workers' compensation board shall not be given collateral estoppel effect in any other action or proceeding arising out of the same occurrence, other than the determination of the existence of an employer employee relationship.
Title
Provides that determinations by the workers' compensation board shall not be given collateral estoppel effect in any other action or proceeding arising out of the same occurrence, other than the determination of the existence of an employer employee relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9149 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.747 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S09149 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - SIGNED CHAP.835