NY A10346 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 10346b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 10346b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes state and New York City maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Title
Establishes state and New York City maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 10346b |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 10346a |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08907 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - referred to health