NY A10337 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ability of the Randolph Academy union free school district to acquire, purchase, lease or otherwise operate territory for use by the school district.
Title
Relates to the ability of the Randolph Academy union free school district to acquire, purchase, lease or otherwise operate territory for use by the school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7471 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.568 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07471 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.149