NY A10336 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9475
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the membership of the Republic airport commission; removes certain provisions of law requiring the commission to conduct a study on payments in lieu of taxes and improvement district taxes and charges with respect to aviation facilities which locate at Republic airport and existing aviation facilities whose leases were renewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the membership of the Republic airport commission; removes certain provisions of law requiring the commission to conduct a study on payments in lieu of taxes and improvement district taxes and charges with respect to aviation facilities which locate at Republic airport and existing aviation facilities whose leases were renewed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s9475
2024-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.136
2024-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.136
2024-05-22Assemblyreported
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-17Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S09475 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback