NY A10336 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that no corporation shall have a membership comprised of fewer than three persons, except for a corporation that has no members; may have a corporation, joint-stock association, unincorporated association or partnership as a sole member, if it is owned or controlled by no fewer than three persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that no corporation shall have a membership comprised of fewer than three persons, except for a corporation that has no members; may have a corporation, joint-stock association, unincorporated association or partnership as a sole member, if it is owned or controlled by no fewer than three persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.411
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2065
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8699
2018-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2018-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.936
2018-05-14Assemblyreported
2018-05-10Assemblyprint number 10336a
2018-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-04-10Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08699 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10336A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10336&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10336&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10336
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10336&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10336A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10336&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10336&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10336#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback