NY A10313 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the form of the Briarcliff Manor fire department benevolent from a corporation to an unincorporated association; makes related provisions.
Title
Changes the form of the Briarcliff Manor fire department benevolent from a corporation to an unincorporated association; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | approval memo.13 |
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.263 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.864 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8531 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.122 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08531 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - approval memo.13