NY A10303 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this legislation is to require the MTA to hold hearings regarding changes in fares or service in each county and to limit hearings to per day.
Title
Requires the MTA to hold hearings in each county that is allocated a voting member of the MTA before proposed changes in services or fares can take effect and shall be limited to one hearing per calendar day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6809 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-18 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-18 | 3RD READING CAL.1050 | |
2010-06-18 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7458 | |
2010-05-18 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-05-18 | delivered to senate | |
2010-05-18 | passed assembly | |
2010-04-15 | advanced to third reading cal.793 | |
2010-04-13 | reported | |
2010-04-08 | print number 10303a | |
2010-04-08 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2010-03-17 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S7458 (Same As) 2010-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10303A