NY A10294 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state disaster emergency loan program to be administered by industrial development agencies for small businesses and small not-for-profit corporations.
Title
Establishes a state disaster emergency loan program to be administered by industrial development agencies for small businesses and small not-for-profit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.109 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.32 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10294a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.646 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8181A |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8181a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.32 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10294a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08181 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.109