NY A10286 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for certain contracts for materials, supplies, or services under $50,000; assures the prudent and economical use of public moneys in the best interests of the taxpayers; requires an authority in the city of New York to develop a procurement corruption prevention training program; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to requirements for certain contracts for materials, supplies, or services under $50,000; assures the prudent and economical use of public moneys in the best interests of the taxpayers; requires an authority in the city of New York to develop a procurement corruption prevention training program; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.419 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.419 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S09800 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT