NY A10281 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that the public service commission require every electric and telecommunications corporation and association to submit their reports to the commission pursuant to a proceeding of the commission to evaluate a standardized facility and equipment transfer program.
Title
Mandates that the public service commission require every electric and telecommunications corporation and association to submit their reports to the commission pursuant to a proceeding of the commission to evaluate a standardized facility and equipment transfer program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.230 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.230 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10281a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |