NY A10281 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Nicholas Cofield to take the competitive exam for police officer and be placed on the eligible list for such position in the town of Niagara.
Title
Authorizes Nicholas Cofield to take the competitive exam for police officer and be placed on the eligible list for such position in the town of Niagara.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.155 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1791 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7618A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.245 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.245 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07618 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10281