NY A10281 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - approval memo.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a professional service corporation, in good standing, to convert to a design professional service corporation if it meets all stated requirements to become a design professional service corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a professional service corporation, in good standing, to convert to a design professional service corporation if it meets all stated requirements to become a design professional service corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senateapproval memo.16
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.467
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.946
2012-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7378A
2012-06-06SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2012-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.66
2012-06-06Assemblyrules report cal.66
2012-06-06Assemblyreported
2012-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-17Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S07378 (Same As) 2012-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10281

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback