NY A10270 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on June 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on June 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to price gouging; prohibits price gouging for essential medical supplies and services and any other essential goods and services used to promote the health or welfare of the public.
Title
Relates to price gouging; prohibits price gouging for essential medical supplies and services and any other essential goods and services used to promote the health or welfare of the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.90 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.30 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10270 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.648 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8189 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.30 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08189 (Same As) 2020-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.90