NY A10252 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - substituted by s8138b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to deferring certain property taxes during a declared state disaster emergency and providing for installment payments thereafter to be determined by the local legislative body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to deferring certain property taxes during a declared state disaster emergency and providing for installment payments thereafter to be determined by the local legislative body.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28Assemblysubstituted by s8138b
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.29
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.29
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-27Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-05-25Assemblyprint number 10252a
2020-05-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to real property taxation
2020-04-08Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S08138 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10252
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10252A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10252&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback